RI H6142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Governor To Establish The Rhode Island "state Of The Arts" Planning Task Force
Title
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Governor To Establish The Rhode Island "state Of The Arts" Planning Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Gordon Fox [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-29 | House | House read and passed |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2013) |
2013-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6142.pdf |