RI H6140 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a licensed individual sewage disposal system installer may, without further licensing, connect an existing sewer lateral pipe to a municipal or public sewer system.
Title
Plumbers, Irrigators, And Water Systems Installers
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6140.pdf |