RI H6127 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires one acre or more public parks to have ADA public restrooms or (2) port-a-potties by July 1, 2025 enforced by DEM.
Title
Town Forests, Parks, And Recreation Systems
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. June Speakman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6127.pdf |