RI H6127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratifies amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Bristol, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of Bristol on November 3, 2020.
Title
Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Bristol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2021-03-30 | House | House read and passed |
2021-03-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/30/2021) |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |