RI H6122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows James Weston Reynolds to join Jenna Alean Mendonsa and Scott William Donovan in marriage on or about June 8, 2019, within the City of Cranston, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-05-16 | House | House read and passed |