RI H6119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes one year moratorium on enforcement of municipal ordinance or zoning requirement that penalizes owners of food service establishments/bars for modifications/alternations to their premises in response to an emergency declaration.
Title
Small Businesses--zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Committee on Small Business: Passage of Sub A (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Committee on Small Business: Passage of Sub A (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2021-05-25 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |