RI H6116 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits state guide plan from requiring any city or town from adopting a housing ordinance that exceeds laws of Rhode Island or city or town's zoning laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-28HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017)
2017-04-13HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback