RI H6114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that all persons seeking appointment as a limited guardian or guardian pursuant to chapter 15 of title 33 ("Limited Guardianships and Guardianship of Adults") be required to undergo a criminal background check.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited Guardianship And Guardianship Of Adults

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-14HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-05-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2019)
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback