RI H6112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the electronic waste preventions, reuse and recycling act.
Title
Electronic Waste Prevention, Reuse And Recycling Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2017-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2017) |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |