RI H6058 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Town Of West Warwick -- Home Rule Charter: the annual financial town meeting in the town of West Warwick for the year 2011 shall be held on June 14, 2011
Title
An Act Relating To The Town Of West Warwick -- Home Rule Charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-10 | House read and passed | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H6058.pdf |