RI H6055 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the DEM adopt motor vehicle emissions standards based on California's promulgated standards; provided that, the California standards achieve greater motor vehicle pollution reductions than the federal standards as required by ยง 31-47.1-1(a).
Title
Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Tina Spears [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) |
2023-03-05 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/09/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6055.pdf |