RI H6051 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Require the secretary of state to establish a system to provide for the electronic registration of voters. The act would limit the use or transfer of the information supplied by the voter in registering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registrations Of Voters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2015-06-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2015)
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2015-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2015-06-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2015)
2015-06-09HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-05HouseScheduled for consideration (06/09/2015)
2015-04-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-04-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015)
2015-04-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback