RI H6040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the attorney general to enter into agreements with other states and counties from other states to recognize and give reciprocity to concealed weapon permit holders allowing them to carry concealed weapons in this state.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6040.pdf |