RI H6024 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the "rights of secured lenders" provision from ยง 34-36.1-2.19 be applicable to condominiums created before July 1, 1982 and creates a process for condominium associations to notify unit mortgage holders for certain association actions.
Title
Condominium Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | House | House read and passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2023) |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2023) |
2023-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |