RI H6018 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for employees to file complaints with a hospital or the director of department of health, for assaultive behavior or violation of law occurring on hospital grounds/requires hospitals to institute safety training for employees.
Title
Hospital Workplace Violence Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-28 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2021) |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |