RI H5989 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against individuals who refuse to be vaccinated.
Title
Mandatory Vaccination Agreement Prohibited
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5989.pdf |