RI H5979 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/16/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/16/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the Rhode Island turnpike and bridge authority for purposes of net metering, which is the process whereby electric consumers are permitted to generate electricity and offset their own electric consumption.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5979.pdf |