RI H5978 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/08/2017)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/08/2017)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends any payments due to MBTA or its operating subcontractor for so long as either is in default on the South County operating agreement.
Title
Railroad Preservation
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/08/2017) |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5978.pdf |