RI H5976 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Gradually eliminates the use of powerboats on Stafford Pond in Tiverton, except for rescue and water treatment plant personnel.
Title
Stafford Pond, Tiverton, Rhode Island
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2015) |
2015-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |