RI H5974 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Invests the chief justice of the supreme court with the explicit authority to address issues affecting the conduct of judicial business and order whatever response(s) he or she deems necessary.
Title
Courts -- Court Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |