RI H5974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the North Kingstown school committee to develop a policy allowing for early entry to kindergarten.
Title
Authorizing The North Kingstown School Committee To Develop A Policy On Early Entry To Kindergarten
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5974.pdf |