RI H5935 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes limited conditions that must be satisfied to permit an increase in the bed capacity of existing nursing facilities, despite the moratorium on expansion.
Title
Nursing Facilities Bed Capacity Moratorium
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |