RI H5934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the date that a new, fully reflective registration plate would be issued from January 1, 2020 to December 1, 2019. The act would also increase the registration fee for fully reflective plates from $6.00 to fifteen dollars $15.00.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles -- Registration Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5934.pdf |