RI H5931 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Vector Cuspis Oceanus, Llc
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Vector Cuspis Oceanus, Llc
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |