RI H5923 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the general treasurer to maintain its transparent treasury initiative to assist the public in accessing information regarding how state pension investments are managed and performing.
Title
Disclosure By The State Investment Commissions Of Performance And Expenses Of Retirement System Investment Managers
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 7 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-06-15 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2017) |
2017-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |