RI H5919 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows parents or guardians of a child to opt out of vaccines for non-casual contact diseases transmitted by sexual contact.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5919.pdf |