RI H5912 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases tax wage base for contributions to TDI /TCI, expands eligibility, increases benefit rates, adds sibling and grandchild in coverage benefits, increases temp caregiver weeks, and institutes fines for not reinstating an employee who uses program.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5912.pdf |