RI H5906 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each member of the board of education to have experience in a position of higher education.
Title
Board Of Education Qualifications
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5906.pdf |