RI H5897 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adds aquaculturist membership and representation to the seafood marketing collaborative of 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seafood Marketing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateSigned by Governor
2015-06-17SenateTransmitted to Governor
2015-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2015-06-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2015)
2015-06-10SenateSenate passed Sub A
2015-06-09SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/10/2015)
2015-05-27SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-05-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2015)
2015-05-20SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2015)
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2015-05-13HouseHouse read and passed
2015-05-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/13/2015)
2015-05-07HouseCommittee recommends passage
2015-05-05HouseScheduled for consideration (05/07/2015)
2015-04-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-03-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2015)
2015-03-13HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback