RI H5896 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property - Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale (would Require Mortgagees And Grantees Of Foreclosed Property To Pay All Applicable Fines And Penalties Assessed By A Municipality On Or Before The Date A Foreclosure Deed Is Recorded)
Title
An Act Relating To Property - Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale (would Require Mortgagees And Grantees Of Foreclosed Property To Pay All Applicable Fines And Penalties Assessed By A Municipality On Or Before The Date A Foreclosure Deed Is Recorded)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013) |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5896.pdf |