RI H5870 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts residential water customers over sixty-five (65) from paying surcharges on their basic water supply rate.
Title
Water Suppliers
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5870.pdf |