RI H5865 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all candidates for public office who receive or expend more than one thousand dollars ($1,000) in any one election cycle to maintain a separate campaign checking account which shall solely contain campaign contributions.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5865.pdf |