RI H5864 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local boards of canvassers to combine voting districts in special elections for approval/rejection of questions or when officials will be elected or in primary elections only with board of election approval.
Title
Voting Districts And Officials
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 23 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 23 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-11 | House | Meeting postponed (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |