RI H5852 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Justices On The Rhode Island Supreme Court To Give A Written Opinion Upon A Question Of Law
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Justices On The Rhode Island Supreme Court To Give A Written Opinion Upon A Question Of Law
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5852.pdf |