RI H5829 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates RIDE to provide regulations to streamline the English Second Language (ESL) and/or English Language Learner (ELL) teaching certificate.
Title
Certification Of Teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee heard |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/09/2021) |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-06-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |