RI H5828 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Encouraging More Persons Of Color To Enter The Field Of Education (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study/make Recommendations To Encourage More Persons Of Color To Enter Field Of Education From April 17, 2020, To April 17, 2022, And Expires On June 17, 2022.)
Title
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Encouraging More Persons Of Color To Enter The Field Of Education (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study/make Recommendations To Encourage More Persons Of Color To Enter Field Of Education From April 17, 2020, To April 17, 2022, And Expires On June 17, 2022.)
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | House read and passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/13/2021) |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |