RI H5805 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a division of marine fisheries within DEM to manage salt water fish and plant harvesting.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |