RI H5788 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a pay for success program to raise funds from non-state government investors to pay for addressing social challenges. If there are positive results, the state would repay the investors with interest.
Title
Rhode Island Pay For Success Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5788.pdf |