RI H5787 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Labor Relations Act (would Prohibit Attorneys From Charging Legal Fees To Towns And Cities For Any Labor Contract In An Amount Greater Than 0.2% Of The Value Of The Contract Entered Into.)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Labor Relations Act (would Prohibit Attorneys From Charging Legal Fees To Towns And Cities For Any Labor Contract In An Amount Greater Than 0.2% Of The Value Of The Contract Entered Into.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5787.pdf |