RI H5752 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Department Of Human Services (would Add The Secretary Of The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services To The Commission On Traumatic Brain Injuries And Updates The Name Change Of The Dhhddh)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Department Of Human Services (would Add The Secretary Of The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services To The Commission On Traumatic Brain Injuries And Updates The Name Change Of The Dhhddh)
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5752.pdf |