RI H5738 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all new school buildings and those undergoing major renovations or substantial repair or replacement to plumbing systems to install water bottle filling stations.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |