RI H5722 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an innkeeper to remove any guest who is a level III high risk sexual offender who attempts to remain a hotel resident for more than thirty (30) consecutive days in any calendar year.
Title
Hotels
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5722.pdf |