RI H5717 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows those individuals with prior convictions for possession with intent to deliver or crimes of violence, to be eligible for the drug court program in Superior Court.
Title
Superior Court
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |