RI H5715 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the judiciary's publicly available list of delinquent persons to the 100 delinquent persons owing the largest amount of court imposed or court related fees, and other monetary obligations which have been unpaid for a period in excess of 90 days.
Title
Courts -- Court Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-01 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |