RI H5712 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits emergency mail ballots at any time prior to any election and would require that electors sign an electronic poll book containing a certificate of facts relating to the circumstances necessitating the emergency application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mail Ballots

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback