RI H5697 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that planning board votes for approval requires a majority vote of the members present at the time of the vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subdivision Of Land

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Judiciary
2019-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-26HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-24HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/26/2019)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback