RI H5696 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a quorum of the zoning board of review shall be a majority of members authorized to vote which may include alternate members.
Title
Local Planning Board Or Commission--zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | House voted to recommit to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5696.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5696A.pdf |