RI H5692 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure (would Make Changes To The Accounting Of Witness Fees Where Witnesses Are Procured Through The Department Of The Attorney General Or The Office Of The Public Defender.)
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure (would Make Changes To The Accounting Of Witness Fees Where Witnesses Are Procured Through The Department Of The Attorney General Or The Office Of The Public Defender.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5692.pdf |