RI H5663 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Meeting postponed (05/24/2017)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Meeting postponed (05/24/2017)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of elementary and secondary education, pursuant to rules promulgated by the commissioner of elementary and secondary education, to develop curricular material on financial literacy.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Meeting postponed (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5663.pdf |