RI H5643 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the renotification requirement to the requisite association subsequent to the sixty (60) day excavation completion requirement for work near public utilities and would require accidents to be reported to 911.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2017-05-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2017) |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Meeting postponed (04/05/2017) |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |